Carabanchel 2010/2011
CityMadrid
Full nameReal Club Deportivo Carabanchel
Diminutive Carabanchel
Foundation1916
Addresscalle Monseñor Óscar Romero,39
28025 Madrid - Spain
Official websitehttp://www.rcdcarabanchel.es/
Roster Carabanchel 2010/2011
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 21/08/1989 |
Age | 21 years |
Defenders
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 09/05/1988 |
Age | 23 years |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 16/08/1982 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 67 kg |
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 08/07/1984 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m79 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 24/07/2011
B.date | 24/01/1985 |
Age | 26 years |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 29/10/1986 |
Age | 24 years |
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 17/03/1992 |
Age | 19 years |
Midfielders
left on : 08/08/2012
B.date | 18/04/1981 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 83 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 18/07/1987 |
Age | 23 years |
left on : 01/07/2012
B.date | 11/10/1973 |
Age | 37 years |
Height | 1m87 |
Weight | 73 kg |
Forwards
left on : 28/07/2011
B.date | 12/07/1984 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 80 kg |
Manager
Staff members
Miguel Melgar | Arrived on : 01/07/2009 |
Sporting Director | Left on : 01/07/2012 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Ivo Carosini | |||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Matallanas | Moscardó | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Pedro Matías | Vallecas | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Alberto Soler | Majadahonda | ||
Staff members in | |||||
31/10 | 31/10/2010 | Miguel Ángel | Leganés | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Victor Aguirre | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Gaumet Carlos | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | David Farías | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | d. L. Fernando | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Pablo Mancheño | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | David Mosqueda | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | C. M. Noel | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | F. D. M. Paco | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | J. J. Peinado | Vicálvaro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | G. P. Raúl | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Javier Santos | Unknown | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | M. Verdú | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
25/10 | 25/10/2010 | Germán Burgos | Catania | manager |
Comments