Rayo Majadahonda 2012/2013
CityMajadahonda
Full nameCF Rayo Majadahonda
Diminutive Majadahonda
Foundation1976
Official websitehttps://www.rayomajadahonda.com
Roster Rayo Majadahonda 2012/2013
Goalkeepers
left on : 08/07/2014
B.date | 09/01/1985 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 79 kg |
Defenders
left on : 04/07/2018
B.date | 27/02/1985 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m92 |
Weight | 87 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 24/03/1986 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m79 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 18/08/1985 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Weight | 79 kg |
left on : 05/07/2018
B.date | 06/06/1987 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Weight | 64 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 14/04/1986 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 07/08/1995 |
Age | 17 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Midfielders
left on : 06/07/2013
B.date | 21/09/1985 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m67 |
Weight | 63 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 15/07/1989 |
Age | 23 years |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 12/03/1991 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Weight | 65 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 01/03/1985 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Weight | 66 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 30/06/1991 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 77 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 07/10/1978 |
Age | 34 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 29/09/1990 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m66 |
Weight | 64 kg |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 29/09/1986 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m68 |
Weight | 63 kg |
left on : 01/01/2013
B.date | 22/04/1986 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 31/01/1991 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 75 kg |
Manager
Staff members
Pedro Calvo | Arrived on : 01/07/2009 |
Head of Youth Development | Left on : 20/11/2015 |
Antonio Ruiz Vilches | Arrived on : 01/07/2010 |
Sporting Director | Left on : 01/07/2012 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Toni Conejo | Málaga B | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Ilias El Bouh | |||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Juan Esnáider | |||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Felipe Cortés | Sanse | Free | |
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Loren | Gandía | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Sergio Oliva | Parla | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Richi | Alcobendas | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Roberto Jimenez | Atlético B | Free | |
24/08 | 24/08/2012 | Jaime Asen | Recreativo | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2013 | Iván Collado | Parla | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2013 | Kouakou Privat | Cacereño | ||
Staff members in | |||||
15/07 | 15/07/2012 | Antonio Iriondo | Free | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Álex Alonso | Rayo B | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Benji | Atlético U-19 | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | D. Ferrer Ruiz | Unknown | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | V. Gorka Unda | St. Pölten | Free | |
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Darío Isern | Andorra CF | ||
18/08 | 18/08/2012 | P. S. Robert | Leganés | Free | |
01/01 | 01/01/2013 | Felipe Cortés | Inter | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | Javier Modrego | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2012 | A. R. Vilches | S Arabia | Sporting Director | |
15/07 | 15/07/2012 | Óscar Garro | Free | manager |
Comments