Cipolletti 2016
Roster Cipolletti 2016
Goalkeepers
left on : 30/06/2016
B.date | 26/05/1989 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 79 kg |
left on : 17/07/2018
B.date | 07/05/1985 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Weight | 69 kg |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 14/05/1988 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 83 kg |
Defenders
B.date | 02/02/1991 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 21/10/2020
B.date | 19/09/1984 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m84 |
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 18/08/1984 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m88 |
Weight | 81 kg |
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 15/03/1987 |
Age | 29 years |
left on : 12/01/2022
B.date | 22/12/1996 |
Age | 19 years |
B.date | 05/07/1983 |
Age | 32 years |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 11/03/1985 |
Age | 31 years |
Height | 1m76 |
left on : 01/01/2021
B.date | 16/03/1988 |
Age | 28 years |
left on : 01/07/2017
B.date | 04/03/1991 |
Age | 25 years |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 08/09/1986 |
Age | 29 years |
Height | 1m71 |
Weight | 71 kg |
B.date | 27/12/1986 |
Age | 29 years |
left on : 01/07/2018
B.date | 13/09/1990 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 79 kg |
left on : 29/06/2018
B.date | 20/12/1986 |
Age | 29 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 69 kg |
left on : 15/08/2019
B.date | 30/05/1994 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m74 |
left on : 01/01/2017
B.date | 26/02/1992 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m86 |
Weight | 80 kg |
B.date | 28/07/1993 |
Age | 22 years |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2017
B.date | 29/09/1987 |
Age | 28 years |
left on : 01/01/2019
B.date | 12/06/1996 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 18/07/2016
B.date | 10/01/1989 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m87 |
Weight | 81 kg |
B.date | 14/05/1984 |
Age | 32 years |
left on : 13/03/2017
B.date | 27/01/1985 |
Age | 31 years |
left on : 01/07/2017
B.date | 23/01/1985 |
Age | 31 years |
left on : 16/01/2017
B.date | 28/07/1988 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Manager
0
Games
0
Victories
0
Losses
Success rate in this team:
0 %
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | M. E. Carrasco | Chaco For Ever | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | J. N. Gaitán | CAI | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | Matias Rinaudo | Gimnasia CDU | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | N. J. Seguel | CAI | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | C. Taborda | Gim. Mendoza | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | G. A. Valente | Alvarado | ||
30/06 | 30/06/2016 | N. M. Sosa | América RJ | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2016 | Ricardo Medina | Sp. Belgrano | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2016 | Lucas Mellado | |||
01/07 | 01/07/2016 | E. R. Vilce | Chaco For Ever | ||
03/07 | 03/07/2016 | M. R. Alasia | Gim. Mendoza | ||
06/07 | 06/07/2016 | Fabio Giménez | Gim. Mendoza | ||
08/07 | 08/07/2016 | Hugo Prieto | SL Alem |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
31/12 | 31/12/2015 | Juan Capurro | Unión | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | Martín Abraham | Gim. Jujuy | Return from loan | |
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | M. A. Carrasco | Unknown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | Kevin Guajardo | Deportivo Roca | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | Rodrigo Herrera | Juve Antoniana | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | Mariano Mauri | Unión | Return from loan | |
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | Luciano Molini | All Boys | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | O. E. Negri | Mitre SdE | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | Ortiz Reyes | Deportivo Roca | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2016 | N. M. Sosa | América RJ | ||
30/06 | 30/06/2016 | Nicolás Caprio | Petapa | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2016 | Facundo Avila | CAI Neuquén | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2016 | Matias Rinaudo | Unknown | ||
18/07 | 18/07/2016 | Jesús Vera | San Jorge | ||
Players retired | |||||
31/12 | 31/12/2015 | M. Ferrari | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
22/12 | 22/12/2015 | R. Pancaldo | Guillermo Brown | manager |
Comments