Dnepr Mogilev 1986
CityMogiliov
Full nameFK Dnepr
Diminutive Dnepr
Foundation1960
Stadium Spartak
Official websitehttp://fcdnepr.by/
Roster Dnepr Mogilev 1986
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/01/1987
B.date | 15/03/1966 |
Age | 20 years |
Weight | 87 kg |
left on : 01/01/1988
B.date | 20/01/1968 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 84 kg |
left on : 01/07/1987
B.date | 17/06/1968 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 82 kg |
left on : 01/01/1987
B.date | 19/08/1969 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m92 |
Weight | 90 kg |
Defenders
left on : 01/01/1987
B.date | 11/06/1968 |
Age | 18 years |
left on : 01/01/1987
B.date | 26/06/1965 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m75 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 01/01/1990
B.date | 13/06/1968 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/01/1988
B.date | 23/05/1963 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 01/01/1992
B.date | 02/03/1962 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/01/1990
B.date | 10/07/1965 |
Age | 20 years |
Midfielders
left on : 01/01/1989
B.date | 23/03/1966 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 01/01/1987
B.date | 14/10/1954 |
Age | 31 years |
left on : 01/01/1988
B.date | 09/05/1965 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 01/01/1992
B.date | 26/07/1968 |
Age | 17 years |
left on : 01/01/1987
B.date | 03/04/1958 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 01/01/1996
B.date | 19/07/1968 |
Age | 17 years |
left on : 01/01/1990
B.date | 27/12/1959 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m71 |
Weight | 66 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/01/1990
B.date | 25/01/1965 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m78 |
Weight | 70 kg |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | D. Kirichenko | Traktor Bobruysk | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Oleg Kononov | Iskra S. | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Igor Romanov | Dinamo Brest | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Skorobogatko | |||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Y. Sverdlov | |||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Yuriy Svirkov | |||
Staff members in | |||||
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Igor Basko | Nyva T. | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Andrey Khmeliov | Shinnik | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | Yuriy Maleyev | Dinamo | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | P. Vasilevsky | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1986 | A. Baydachnyi | Free | manager |
Comments