ASEC Mimosas 1997
CityAbidjan
Full nameASEC Mimosas
Diminutive ASEC
Foundation1948
Stadium Stade Felix Houphouet-Boigny
Official websitehttps://www.asec.ci
Roster ASEC Mimosas 1997
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/07/2003
B.date | 29/12/1972 |
Age | 24 years |
left on : 01/01/2002
B.date | 16/04/1968 |
Age | 29 years |
Defenders
left on : 19/01/2001
B.date | 02/02/1974 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m87 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/07/1998
B.date | 10/10/1971 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 01/07/1998
B.date | 15/02/1975 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 01/01/1998
B.date | 06/02/1971 |
Age | 26 years |
left on : 01/07/1999
B.date | 28/10/1969 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/07/1997
B.date | 06/04/1963 |
Age | 34 years |
left on : 01/01/1998
B.date | 03/03/1975 |
Age | 22 years |
left on : 01/07/1997
B.date | 10/04/1977 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m89 |
Weight | 77 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2000
B.date | 14/12/1980 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 76 kg |
left on : 01/01/1999
B.date | 02/02/1976 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m71 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/01/1999
B.date | 10/01/1981 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m75 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/07/2002
B.date | 26/02/1971 |
Age | 26 years |
left on : 01/01/2000
B.date | 03/11/1967 |
Age | 29 years |
left on : 01/07/1997
B.date | 11/07/1978 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m65 |
Weight | 63 kg |
left on : 01/01/1999
B.date | 03/04/1970 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/01/1999
B.date | 27/12/1975 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m66 |
Weight | 65 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/2000
B.date | 10/08/1981 |
Age | 15 years |
Height | 1m81 |
left on : 30/06/1998
B.date | 19/08/1982 |
Age | 14 years |
Height | 1m81 |
Weight | 71 kg |
left on : 01/01/1998
B.date | 08/10/1980 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 68 kg |
left on : 01/01/1998
B.date | 09/04/1972 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Manager
Staff members
Jean-Marc Guillou | Arrived on : 01/07/1993 |
Chief Executive | Left on : 01/01/1999 |
Régis Laguesse | Arrived on : 01/07/1997 |
Sporting Director | Left on : 01/07/1999 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1997 | Youssouf Kamara | |||
01/01 | 01/01/1997 | Idrissa Keita | |||
01/01 | 01/01/1997 | A. K. Sylla | |||
01/01 | 01/01/1997 | Mamadou Zongo | RC Bobo | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | D.-O. Sié | Nagoya | ||
Staff members in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Régis Laguesse | Angers B | Sporting Director |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1997 | B. Kalou | Feyenoord B | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | Idrissa Keita | Levante | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | A. Soumahoro | Ste-Geneviève | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1997 | J.-M. Gbahou | Retired | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1997 | B. Aka Kouame | Retired | ||
Players released | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1997 | Lamine Bangoura | Free |
Comments