ASEC Mimosas 1994
CityAbidjan
Full nameASEC Mimosas
Diminutive ASEC
Foundation1948
Stadium Stade Felix Houphouet-Boigny
Official websitehttps://www.asec.ci
Roster ASEC Mimosas 1994
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/07/1994
B.date | 15/06/1966 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m85 |
Weight | 79 kg |
left on : 01/07/2003
B.date | 29/12/1972 |
Age | 21 years |
Defenders
left on : 19/01/2001
B.date | 02/02/1974 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m87 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/01/1998
B.date | 06/02/1971 |
Age | 23 years |
left on : 01/07/1997
B.date | 06/04/1963 |
Age | 31 years |
left on : 01/01/1997
B.date | 01/04/1973 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2002
B.date | 26/02/1971 |
Age | 23 years |
left on : 01/01/2000
B.date | 03/11/1967 |
Age | 26 years |
left on : 01/07/1996
B.date | 26/06/1966 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m78 |
left on : 01/07/1996
B.date | 03/04/1970 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m76 |
Weight | 72 kg |
left on : 01/01/1999
B.date | 27/12/1975 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m66 |
Weight | 65 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/01/1997
B.date | 12/01/1978 |
Age | 16 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 77 kg |
left on : 01/07/1994
B.date | 18/07/1972 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Weight | 70 kg |
left on : 01/07/1995
B.date | 22/12/1968 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 67 kg |
left on : 01/07/1995
B.date | 04/03/1967 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m67 |
Weight | 74 kg |
left on : 01/07/1994
B.date | 17/09/1963 |
Age | 30 years |
left on : 01/07/1996
B.date | 25/02/1970 |
Age | 24 years |
Manager
Staff members
Jean-Marc Guillou | Arrived on : 01/07/1993 |
Chief Executive | Left on : 01/01/1999 |
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1994 | J.-M. Gbahou | SC Adjamé | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1994 | A. K. Koné | |||
01/07 | 01/07/1994 | B. Kalou | |||
Staff members in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/1994 | Oscar Fullone | FC Sion | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/02 | 01/02/1994 | Kassy-Kouadio | Africa | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1994 | Y. L. Amani | Africa | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1994 | Michel Bassolé | Muscat | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1994 | A. Gouaméné | ASTD | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/1994 | Vilasco Fallet | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1994 | E. Manglé | manager |
Comments