Central Norte 2010/2011
Roster Central Norte 2010/2011
Goalkeepers
left on : 31/12/2012
B.date | 01/06/1987 |
Age | 24 years |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 19/08/1983 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m79 |
Weight | 86 kg |
Defenders
left on : 02/07/2012
B.date | 15/01/1983 |
Age | 28 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 13/05/1985 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m90 |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 21/02/1986 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m84 |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 27/12/1987 |
Age | 23 years |
Height | 1m80 |
Weight | 80 kg |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 25/10/1977 |
Age | 33 years |
Height | 1m79 |
left on : 01/07/2016
B.date | 08/10/1985 |
Age | 25 years |
left on : 01/07/2013
B.date | 10/04/1987 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m72 |
Weight | 70 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/2020
B.date | 16/10/1985 |
Age | 25 years |
left on : 01/01/2016
B.date | 06/10/1980 |
Age | 30 years |
left on : 30/06/2012
B.date | 20/04/1984 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 27/06/1968 |
Age | 43 years |
left on : 01/01/2012
B.date | 15/04/1983 |
Age | 28 years |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 20/01/1989 |
Age | 22 years |
Forwards
left on : 01/01/2015
B.date | 05/12/1977 |
Age | 33 years |
B.date | 11/03/1987 |
Age | 24 years |
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 15/07/1986 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m76 |
left on : 31/12/2011
B.date | 05/02/1990 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m87 |
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 20/11/1980 |
Age | 30 years |
Height | 1m82 |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 09/04/1985 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m79 |
left on : 10/07/2013
B.date | 14/05/1984 |
Age | 27 years |
left on : 01/01/2011
B.date | 17/04/1976 |
Age | 35 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 30/06/2012
B.date | 21/09/1989 |
Age | 21 years |
Height | 1m68 |
Weight | 67 kg |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 05/08/1984 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m65 |
Weight | 65 kg |
left on : 01/07/2011
B.date | 16/05/1982 |
Age | 29 years |
Height | 1m89 |
Weight | 80 kg |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | J. M. Cortés | 9 de Julio Rafaela | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Germán Real | C. Cordoba R | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | L. Rodríguez | Gim y Tiro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Villasanti | Boca Unidos | ||
01/08 | 01/08/2010 | Pablo Motta | Guillermo Brown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | Denis Caputo | Cobresal | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | Eduardo Sosa | Racing Córdoba | ||
02/01 | 02/01/2011 | Germán Weiner | Free | ||
07/01 | 07/01/2011 | L. A. Silba | Rampla | ||
Staff members in | |||||
22/02 | 22/02/2011 | Luis Islas | Indep. | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | F. Bongioanni | GPJ | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | J. M. Cortés | Batavia Union | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | Germán Real | Unknown | ||
01/01 | 01/01/2011 | Emanuel Torres | Talleres P | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/2010 | Jonathan Baldo | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
07/05 | 07/05/2011 | Luis Islas | Free | manager |
Comments