Peñarol 1984
Roster Peñarol 1984
Goalkeepers
left on : 01/07/1984
B.date | 04/09/1959 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m84 |
left on : 01/07/1988
B.date | 24/09/1965 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m93 |
Weight | 89 kg |
left on : 01/01/1995
B.date | 02/03/1967 |
Age | 17 years |
Height | 1m84 |
Defenders
left on : 01/07/1985
B.date | 13/04/1962 |
Age | 22 years |
Height | 1m83 |
Weight | 83 kg |
left on : 01/01/1985
B.date | 04/09/1952 |
Age | 31 years |
left on : 01/07/1985
B.date | 20/05/1958 |
Age | 26 years |
left on : 01/07/1985
B.date | 06/03/1962 |
Age | 22 years |
left on : 01/07/1986
B.date | 20/02/1955 |
Age | 29 years |
left on : 01/01/1992
B.date | 24/09/1965 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m69 |
Weight | 68 kg |
Midfielders
left on : 01/07/1984
B.date | 24/04/1959 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m79 |
left on : 01/08/1989
B.date | 17/06/1965 |
Age | 19 years |
Height | 1m74 |
Weight | 73 kg |
left on : 01/07/1989
B.date | 05/01/1965 |
Age | 19 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 78 kg |
left on : 01/01/1986
B.date | 10/02/1960 |
Age | 24 years |
Height | 1m83 |
left on : 01/01/1986
B.date | 06/08/1956 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m78 |
left on : 01/07/1985
B.date | 09/04/1958 |
Age | 26 years |
Height | 1m79 |
left on : 01/08/1986
B.date | 26/10/1963 |
Age | 20 years |
Height | 1m82 |
Weight | 80 kg |
Forwards
left on : 01/07/1984
B.date | 20/06/1959 |
Age | 25 years |
Height | 1m75 |
Weight | 65 kg |
left on : 01/07/1986
B.date | 06/07/1956 |
Age | 27 years |
Height | 1m75 |
Weight | 74 kg |
left on : 01/07/1984
B.date | 02/02/1952 |
Age | 32 years |
Height | 1m77 |
Weight | 75 kg |
left on : 01/07/1987
B.date | 14/07/1960 |
Age | 23 years |
left on : 01/01/1988
B.date | 13/09/1965 |
Age | 18 years |
Height | 1m80 |
left on : 01/01/1987
B.date | 01/05/1961 |
Age | 23 years |
Manager
Transfers: In
Players in | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Diego Aguirre | Liverpool | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | D. Enríquez | Cucuta | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Óscar Ferro | |||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | J. O. Herrera | |||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Sergio Santín | Atl. Nacional | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | A. Alzamendi | Estudiantes | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | J. A. Batista | Cerro | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | A. Dominguez | |||
Staff members in | |||||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | C. L. Menotti | Barça | manager |
Transfers: Out
Players out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | D. Cáceres | Emelec | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Miguel Falero | Platense | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | J. V. Morales | Talleres | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Alexis Noble | Uni. Catolica | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Próspero Silva | Progreso | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Jose Villarreal | Central Español | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | Fernando Alvez | Libertad | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | Fernando Morena | Boca Juniors | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | Venancio Ramos | Lens | ||
01/07 | 01/07/1984 | Mario Saralegui | Elche | ||
Players retired | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Jair Gaucho | Retired | ||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Daniel Quevedo | Retired | ||
Staff members out | |||||
01/01 | 01/01/1984 | Hugo Bagnulo | Deceased | manager |
Comments